AZ HB2617 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1145
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-11 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Temporary irrigation efficiency projects fund.
Title
Temporary irrigation efficiency projects fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Becky Nutt [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-0-1-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1145 (Replaced by) 2020-02-18 - Chapter 2