AZ SB1145 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Note: Replaces legislation HB2617

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-18 - Chapter 2
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Temporary irrigation efficiency projects fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Temporary irrigation efficiency projects fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-18SenateChapter 2
2020-02-18SenateGovernor Signed
2020-02-12SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-02-11SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (50-8-1-1)
2020-02-06HouseTransmit to House
2020-02-06SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-1-1-0)
2020-02-06SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-04SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-04SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-03SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-02-03SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-01-30SenateSenate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0)
2020-01-22SenateSenate read second time
2020-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-01-21SenateAssigned to Senate WAG Committee
2020-01-21SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2617 (Replaces) 2020-02-11 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
45615.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73112
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1145p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/sb1145s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/laws/0002.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/s.1145kerr0338.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73112&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73112&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73112&billStatusActionId=193112&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73112&billStatusActionId=193135&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73112&billStatusActionId=193284&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback