AZ HB2604 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-04 - House motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Meat; poultry; sale; misrepresentation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Meat; poultry; sale; misrepresentation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-04HouseHouse motion to reconsider third reading
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading FAILED voting: (22-36-2-0)
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-26HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
2019-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-25HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-21HouseHouse LAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-12HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-11HouseAssigned to House LAG Committee
2019-02-11HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32099New CodeSee Bill Text
32156Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3606Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72239
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2604p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2604h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72239&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72239&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72239&billStatusActionId=187075&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72239&billStatusActionId=187250&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72239&billStatusActionId=187666&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72239&billStatusActionId=187683&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback