AZ HB2604 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to Senate HHS Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-16 - Referred to Senate HHS Committee
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Epinephrine auto-injectors
Title
Epinephrine auto-injectors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-12 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-2-1-0) |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-03 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0) |
2015-02-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-17 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-0-0-0) |
2015-02-09 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | House read second time |
2015-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2015-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |