AZ HB2603 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-03 - Chapter 122
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Corporations; blockchain technology

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Corporations; blockchain technology

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-03SenateChapter 122
2018-04-03SenateGovernor Signed
2018-03-29SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-03-28HouseTransmit to House
2018-03-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2018-03-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19SenateSenate consent calendar
2018-03-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-13SenateSenate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-03-05SenateSenate read second time
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-03-01SenateAssigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee
2018-03-01SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (56-3-1-0)
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-13HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
10140Amended CodeSee Bill Text
447003Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70842
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2603p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2603h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0122.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70842&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70842&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70842&billStatusActionId=181462&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70842&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70842&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70842&billStatusActionId=182758&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback