AZ HB2587 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-29 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
School districts; unification assistance
Title
School districts; unification assistance
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Tobin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-29 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-29 | Senate third reading , voting: (23-4-3-0) | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2010-04-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-03 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | House third reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-22 | House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM | |
2010-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-17 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-28 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-02-08 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-01 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2010-02-01 | House read second time | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2010-01-28 | Introduced in House and read first time |