AZ HB2573 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-26 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; laboratory; Navajo technical university
Title
Appropriation; laboratory; Navajo technical university
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-24 | House | House NREW Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2020-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |