AZ HB2568 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-06 - Chapter 220
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Insurance premium tax reduction
Title
Insurance premium tax reduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-06 | Chapter 220 | |
2015-04-06 | Governor Signed | |
2015-04-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-9-1-0) |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-0-1-0) |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2015-03-03 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2015-03-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-22-0-0) |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2015-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2015-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-3-0-3-0) |
2015-01-29 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2015-02-04 | House | House INS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) |
2015-02-02 | House | Referred to House INS Committee |
2015-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Assigned to House INS Committee |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |