AZ HB2563 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; elective; biblical influence
Title
Schools; elective; biblical influence
Sponsors
Rep. Terri Proud [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 8 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 8 N: 44 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2012-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-12 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-12 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-03-12 | Senate Consent Calendar March 12, 2012 @ 1:20 PM with Objections | |
2012-03-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-02-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-23 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2012-02-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-21 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-21 | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-15-2-0) | |
2012-02-16 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2012-02-07 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-07 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-30 | House ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-2-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |