AZ HB2558 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 41-8)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Statewide ADA coordinator; appropriation
Title
Statewide ADA coordinator; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-1-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2019-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |