AZ HB2551 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-03 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriation; state parks; heritage fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriation; state parks; heritage fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2020-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-28SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-27HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (54-6-0-0)
2020-02-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-24HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-24HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-19HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-1-0-1-0-0)
2020-01-30HouseHouse LAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-28HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-28HouseHouse NREW Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House LAG Committee
2020-01-27HouseAssigned to House NREW Committee
2020-01-27HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback