AZ HB2545 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1530

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Chapter 304
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

K-12 education; budget reconciliation; 2017-2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 education; budget reconciliation; 2017-2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Motion Senator Yee moved that HB 2545 be substituted for SB 1530. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Bolding to include Bolding Floor Amendment to the Bill (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12SenateChapter 304
2017-05-12SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-04HouseTransmit to House
2017-05-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0)
2017-05-04SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2545 substituted for SB 1530. Motion carried.
2017-05-04SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-05-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-05-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0)
2017-05-04HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-05-04HouseHouse motion to amend
2017-05-04HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-04HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-03HouseHouse read second time
2017-05-03HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0)
2017-05-03HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-5-0-1-0-0)
2017-05-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-05-02HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2017-05-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1530 (Replaces) 2017-05-04 - Senate motion to amend

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15249.06Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15249.07New CodeSee Bill Text
15249.08New CodeSee Bill Text
15249.09New CodeSee Bill Text
15901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15945Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69578
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2545p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2545h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0304.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2545appropriations.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2545carter6.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69578&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69578&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69578&billStatusActionId=177428&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69578&billStatusActionId=177427&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69578&billStatusActionId=177429&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69578&billStatusActionId=177447&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69578&billStatusActionId=177446&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback