AZ SB1530 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Legislation has been replaced by HB2545

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Senate motion to amend
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

K-12 education; budget reconciliation; 2017-2018

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 education; budget reconciliation; 2017-2018

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Senator Quezada to include the Quezada #1 flr amend (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Senator Bradley to include the Bradley #3 flr amend (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Senator Bradley to include the Bradley #2 flr amend (Y: 13 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04SenateSenate motion to amend
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-05-04SenateSenate motion to amend
2017-05-04SenateSenate motion to amend
2017-05-04SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-04SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-05-04SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-05-03SenateSenate read second time
2017-05-03SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0)
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2017-05-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Same As/Similar To

HB2545 (Replaced by) 2017-05-12 - Chapter 304

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
152041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15249.06Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15249.07New CodeSee Bill Text
15249.08New CodeSee Bill Text
15249.09New CodeSee Bill Text
15901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15945Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69594
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1530p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/sb1530s.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.1530flooryarbrough2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1530456kh.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1530459sf.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1530bradley148.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1530bradley308.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1530farley533.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1530quezada604.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.1530quezada313.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69594&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69594&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69594&billStatusActionId=177434&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69594&billStatusActionId=177437&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69594&billStatusActionId=177435&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69594&billStatusActionId=177436&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback