AZ HB2516 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Airports; school buildings
Title
Airports; school buildings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-2-3-0) |
2018-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-15 | House | House GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-02-13 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2018-02-13 | House | House LIA Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House LIA Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 153 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 189.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |