AZ HB2505 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-28 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Assisted living; refunds; escrow accounts
Title
Assisted living; refunds; escrow accounts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Applicability
Assisted Living
Disclosure Statement
Escrow Accounts
Insurance - Title 20
Life Care Contracts
Refund
Assisted Living
Disclosure Statement
Escrow Accounts
Insurance - Title 20
Life Care Contracts
Refund
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1804 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1812 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |