AZ HB2504 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-19 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
STO scholarships; foster care students
Title
STO scholarships; foster care students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-24 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-19 | Governor Vetoed | |
2023-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2023-06-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2023-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-24 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Foster Care Students
School Tuition Organization (sto)
Sto (see Also: School Tuition Organization)
Sto Scholarships
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
School Tuition Organization (sto)
Sto (see Also: School Tuition Organization)
Sto Scholarships
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 1504 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |