AZ HB2500 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
SFB; procurement; building renewal grants
Title
SFB; procurement; building renewal grants
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-27 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-17 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-1-0-2-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 2032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |