AZ HB2480 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-27 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Collegiate women's wrestling program; appropriation
Title
Collegiate women's wrestling program; appropriation
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0) |
2023-02-20 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-2-1-1-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2023-01-19 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriation
Collegiate Women's Wrestling Program
Education - Title 15
Postsecondary Education
Scholarships
Collegiate Women's Wrestling Program
Education - Title 15
Postsecondary Education
Scholarships