AZ HB2476 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-12 - Chapter 242
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School property; sales; leases; use
Title
School property; sales; leases; use
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-12 | Chapter 242 | |
2016-05-12 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-0-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |