AZ HB2470 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Public defender; duties; reimbursement
Title
Public defender; duties; reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-22 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-21 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-3-1-0) | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Consent Calendar April 12, 2010 @ 2:35 PM | |
2010-04-20 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) | |
2010-04-05 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-04-05 | Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-04-05 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-25 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-23 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-23 | House third reading , voting: (54-0-6-0) | |
2010-03-16 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-08 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-08 | House RULES Committee action: amended constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-25 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |