AZ HB2458 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-23 - House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Child protection registry; prohibited communications
Title
Child protection registry; prohibited communications
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Rep. Mark Cardenas [D] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] |
Rep. Regina Cobb [R] | Rep. Justin Olson [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Children and Family Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Children and Family Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | House CFA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to House CFA Committee |
2016-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | Assigned to House CFA Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |