AZ HB2447 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - House third reading FAILED voting: (28-32-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - House third reading FAILED voting: (28-32-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ADOT; ports of entry; reporting
Title
ADOT; ports of entry; reporting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (28-32-0-0) |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-15 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |