AZ HB2439 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Biasiucci, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2439. Passed by vv.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Biasiucci, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2439. Passed by vv.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Property conveyance; foreign entities; prohibition
Title
Property conveyance; foreign entities; prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Motion Motion by Representative Biasiucci, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2439. Passed by vv. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-12 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2024-02-12 - House - House Land, Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Motion by Representative Biasiucci, notwithstanding House Rule 23(A), to further extend the reconsideration period for HB2439. Passed by vv. |
2024-02-22 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2024-02-22 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (16-41-2-0) |
2024-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-1-1-0-0) |
2024-02-12 | House | House LARA Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House LARA Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Foreign Entities
Land Sales
Limits On Sales Of State Lands
Prohibition
Property - Title 33
Property Conveyance
Public Lands - Title 37
Land Sales
Limits On Sales Of State Lands
Prohibition
Property - Title 33
Property Conveyance
Public Lands - Title 37
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
33 | 459 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
37 | 240 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |