AZ HB2438 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-25 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
College credit by examination; appropriations
Title
College credit by examination; appropriations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-27 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-5-0-2-0-0) |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |