AZ HB2436 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Senate read second time
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; memorial; January 8 victims
Title
Appropriation; memorial; January 8 victims
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Clodfelter [R] | Sen. Kirsten Engel [D] | Rep. Daniel Hernandez [D] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-11-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-22 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-2-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriations
Department Of Administration
Jccr
Jlbc
Joint Committee On Capital Review
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Legislative Council
Department Of Administration
Jccr
Jlbc
Joint Committee On Capital Review
Joint Legislative Budget Committee
Legislative Council