AZ HB2434 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Bail bond requirements; cash; secured
Title
Bail bond requirements; cash; secured
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Steve Gallardo [D] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
Rep. David Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Border Security, Federalism and States Sovereignty Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Governor Vetoed | |
2012-04-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-09 | House final reading , voting: (38-17-5-0) | |
2012-04-09 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-05 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-05 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-04 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-04 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-8-2-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | Senate BSFSS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-2-1-0) | |
2012-03-12 | Referred to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2012-03-22 | Senate JUD Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-12 | Assigned to Senate BSFSS Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-06 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-28 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-27 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-16 | House JUD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-01-19 | House read second time | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-01-18 | Introduced in House and read first time |