AZ HB2429 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Mediation agreements; privileged communications
Title
Mediation agreements; privileged communications
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-22 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-21 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-21 | Senate third reading , voting: (27-2-1-0) | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Consent Calendar April 05, 2010 @ 3:05 PM | |
2010-04-20 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-20 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-29 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-11 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-11 | House third reading , voting: (58-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | House Consent Calendar March 02, 2010 @ 3:55 PM | |
2010-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-2-2-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-28 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |