AZ HB2417 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Concessionaire loans; restrictions.
Title
Concessionaire loans; restrictions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-09 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-10 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-05 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House final reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2012-04-05 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-04 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-04 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-03 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-03 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-26 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-03-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-29 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-28 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-28 | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-27 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-09 | House TI Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to House TI Committee | |
2012-02-07 | House read second time | |
2012-02-06 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Assigned to House TI Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Introduced in House and read first time |