AZ HB2410 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 325
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Workers' compensation; firefighters; heart-related cases

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers' compensation; firefighters; heart-related cases

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Health Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateChapter 325
2017-05-22SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-04HouseTransmit to House
2017-05-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0)
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-04-11SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-11SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-04-10SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-20SenateSenate COMPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate COMPS Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (55-3-2-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-15HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-15HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-02-09HouseHouse HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-08HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House HEALTH Committee
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
231043.05New CodeSee Bill Text
23901Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69416
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2410p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2410h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0325.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69416&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69416&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69416&billStatusActionId=175367&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69416&billStatusActionId=175243&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69416&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69416&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69416&billStatusActionId=177369&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69416&billStatusActionId=177387&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback