AZ HB2409 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Chapter 154
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Multi-county water districts; storage tax
Title
Multi-county water districts; storage tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Senate | Chapter 154 |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-04-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-6-3-0) |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-13-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-21 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-01 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-1-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Delayed Repeal
Multi-county Water Conservation Districts
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Storage Tax
Multi-county Water Conservation Districts
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Storage Tax