AZ HB2406 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Counties; municipal land acquisition; limitation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Counties; municipal land acquisition; limitation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Local and International Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10SenateChapter 296
2017-05-10SenateGovernor Signed
2017-05-08SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-05-04HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (31-28-1-0)
2017-05-04HouseHouse concurs
2017-05-04HouseTransmit to House
2017-05-04SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2017-05-04SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-04-17SenateSenate motion to reconsider third reading
2017-04-13SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (14-16-0-0)
2017-04-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2017-03-27SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2017-03-07SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-07SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-06SenateSenate consent calendar
2017-03-06SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0)
2017-02-21SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-20SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-17SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-16HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (51-7-2-0)
2017-02-14HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-14HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-13HouseHouse consent calendar
2017-02-13HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-08HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-08HouseHouse LIA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-07HouseAssigned to House LIA Committee
2017-02-07HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11264.07New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69412
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2406p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2406h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2406s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0296.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2406yee0201.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69412&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69412&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69412&billStatusActionId=174937&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69412&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69412&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69412&billStatusActionId=176709&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69412&billStatusActionId=176897&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69412&billStatusActionId=176950&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69412&billStatusActionId=176992&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69412&billStatusActionId=177397&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69412&billStatusActionId=177398&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69412&billStatusActionId=177404&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69412&billStatusActionId=177406&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback