AZ HB2403 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-18-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-28 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-18-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tax lien deeds; aggregate fees
Title
Tax lien deeds; aggregate fees
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Rep. Mark Cardenas [D] | Rep. Jonathan Larkin [D] | Rep. Mark Finchem [R] |
Sen. Thomas Shope [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 11 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (11-18-1-0) |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-0-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-29 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-29 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-28-1-0) |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-11 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-1-0-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |