AZ HB2388 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Private postsecondary education grants

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Private postsecondary education grants

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenateGovernor Signed
2017-04-26SenateTransmitted to Governor
2017-04-26HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (31-23-6-0)
2017-04-26HouseHouse concurs
2017-04-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2017-04-19HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2017-04-19HouseTransmit to House
2017-04-19SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0)
2017-04-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-03-21SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-21SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2017-03-20SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2017-03-16SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2017-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2017-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2017-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2017-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (46-12-2-0)
2017-02-21HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2017-02-15HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-15HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2017-02-15HouseHouse Committee of the Whole consent calendar
2017-02-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0)
2017-02-13HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
2017-02-06HouseHouse read second time
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2017-02-02HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2017-02-02HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151855New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/69391
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2388p.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2388h.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/bills/hb2388s.htm
Texthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/laws/0243.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2388alston.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/h.2388boyer.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/h.2388education.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/proposed/s.23881203.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2388ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/1r/adopted/s.2388allen s0911.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69391&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69391&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69391&billStatusActionId=175363&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69391&billStatusActionId=175302&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69391&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=69391&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69391&billStatusActionId=176896&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69391&billStatusActionId=177066&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69391&billStatusActionId=177237&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=69391&billStatusActionId=177257&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback