AZ HB2387 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-01 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
DHS; exemption; certain foods; wineries
Title
DHS; exemption; certain foods; wineries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-4-1-0) |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-1-8-0) |
2021-03-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-02-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-16 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |