AZ HB2383 | 2023 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Legislation replaced by SB1171
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Conformity; internal revenue code.
Title
Conformity; internal revenue code.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Carter [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-18 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2023-02-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2023-02-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2023-01-18 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2023-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1171 (Replaced by) 2023-03-03 - Chapter 2
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
42 | 1001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |