AZ HB2367 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS; annual waiver submittals
Title
AHCCCS; annual waiver submittals
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Tobin [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Reform and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Reform and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Governor Vetoed | |
2014-04-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-17 | House | House final reading , voting: (35-22-3-0) |
2014-04-17 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-09 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (3-2-2-0) |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-03-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-03-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-22-3-0) |
2014-03-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-06 | House | House RHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0-0) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to House RHS Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RHS Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |