AZ HB2359 | 2015 | Fifty-second Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Liquor licenses; aggrieved parties; hearing

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Liquor licenses; aggrieved parties; hearing

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-04 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-25SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2015-03-24SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-24SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2015-03-23SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration
2015-03-03SenateReferred to Senate RULES Committee
2015-03-18SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2015-03-04SenateReferred to Senate GOV Committee
2015-03-04SenateSenate read second time
2015-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2015-03-03SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2015-02-13HouseTransmit to Senate
2015-02-12HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (33-25-2-0)
2015-02-12HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2015-02-10HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-10HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2015-02-09HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-3-0-0-0)
2015-01-28HouseReferred to House RULES Committee
2015-02-04HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0-0)
2015-01-29HouseReferred to House COM Committee
2015-01-29HouseHouse read second time
2015-01-28HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2015-01-28HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2015-01-28HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback