AZ HB2337 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 362
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Regulation; deficiencies; opportunity to correct
Title
Regulation; deficiencies; opportunity to correct
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Chapter 362 | |
2016-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-6-0-0) |
2016-02-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |