AZ HB2334 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Regional behavioral health authorities; requirements
Title
Regional behavioral health authorities; requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Healthcare and Medical Liability Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Senate HMLR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-0-0) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate HMLR Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-05 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-26-0-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-28 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-27 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in House and read first time |