AZ HB2330 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate GOV Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Senate GOV Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Fire districts; formation; county supervisors
Title
Fire districts; formation; county supervisors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2024-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-2-3-0) |
2024-02-22 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2024-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-2-3-2-0-0) |
2024-01-22 | House | House read second time |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2024-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Board Of Directors
Board Of Supervisors
County Supervisors
Fire Districts
Formation
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Board Of Supervisors
County Supervisors
Fire Districts
Formation
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
48 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
48 | 825 | New Code | See Bill Text |