AZ HB2330 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Chapter 83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of public safety; continuation
Title
Department of public safety; continuation
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Chapter 83 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-03-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (15-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2022-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Continuation
Department Of Public Safety (dps)
Dps (see Also: Department Of Public Safety)
Purpose (s)
Repeal (s)
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Termination (s)
Department Of Public Safety (dps)
Dps (see Also: Department Of Public Safety)
Purpose (s)
Repeal (s)
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Termination (s)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3022.11 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3030.11 | New Code | See Bill Text |