AZ HB2324 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-04 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
VLT; registration; exemptions; purple heart
Title
VLT; registration; exemptions; purple heart
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-15-0-0) |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-11-1-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-02-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-01-19 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2017-01-18 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |