AZ HB2323 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-11 - Chapter 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; inhalers; contracted nurses
Title
Schools; inhalers; contracted nurses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Chapter 183 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-03-19 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2018-02-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-05 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-05 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-29 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 189.04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 342 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |