AZ HB2319 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-27 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
JTEDs; letter grades; exclusion
Title
JTEDs; letter grades; exclusion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (51-6-3-0) |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-02-05 | House | House ED Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2018-01-17 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2018-01-16 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 241 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 393.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |