AZ HB2318 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Chapter 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Texting while driving; prohibition; enforcement

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Texting while driving; prohibition; enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22SenateChapter 112
2019-04-22SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-18SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-18HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (44-16-0-0)
2019-04-18HouseHouse concurs
2019-04-09HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-09HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-08HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (20-9-1-0)
2019-04-08SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-02SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-01SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-27SenateSenate TPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-2-0-0)
2019-02-26SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-25SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-15SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-14HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0)
2019-02-12HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-12HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-11HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-11HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-06HouseHouse TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-01-31HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House TRANS Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
28364Amended CodeSee Bill Text
285102Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71430
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2318p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2318h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2318s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0112.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2318pratt.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.23180157.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.23180247.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.23180218.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2318tps.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2318rules.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71430&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71430&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71430&billStatusActionId=186580&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71430&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71430&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71430&billStatusActionId=188839&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71430&billStatusActionId=188846&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71430&billStatusActionId=189027&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71430&billStatusActionId=189028&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback