AZ HB2310 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Executive orders; review; attorney general

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Executive orders; review; attorney general

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-15 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseTransmit to House
2021-04-07SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0)
2021-03-30SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-03-23SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-23SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2021-03-22SenateSenate consent calendar
2021-03-22SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2021-03-08SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-1-0)
2021-03-03SenateSenate read second time
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2021-03-02SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2021-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2021-02-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2021-02-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2021-02-22HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2021-02-22HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2021-02-15HouseHouse MAPS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-6-0-0-0-0)
2021-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2021-01-26HouseAssigned to House MAPS Committee
2021-01-26HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
411304.07New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/74789
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2310p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2310h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/bills/hb2310s.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/proposed/h.2310roberts.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/h.2310military affairs public safety.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/55leg/1r/adopted/s.2310floorleach.docx.htm
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484160
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/484995
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/485514
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/486465
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488312
Supplementhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/GetDocumentPdf/488676
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74789&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74789&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74789&billStatusActionId=201249&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74789&billStatusActionId=201688&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74789&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=74789&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74789&billStatusActionId=203448&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=74789&billStatusActionId=203568&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback