AZ HB2284 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - House final reading FAILED, voting: (24-31-5-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - House final reading FAILED, voting: (24-31-5-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mall commission; Assyrian monument
Title
Mall commission; Assyrian monument
Sponsors
Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 31 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-10 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | House final reading FAILED, voting: (24-31-5-0) |
2017-05-10 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2017-05-09 | House | House final reading FAILED, voting: (20-35-5-0) |
2017-05-09 | House | House concurs |
2017-05-09 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2017-05-09 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2017-05-08 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-3-3-0) |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-02-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2017-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Assyrian Genocide
Department Of Administration
Government Information Technology
Governmental Mall Commission
Jlbc
Memorials
Public Buildings And Improvements
State Government
Department Of Administration
Government Information Technology
Governmental Mall Commission
Jlbc
Memorials
Public Buildings And Improvements
State Government
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |