AZ HB2255 | 2022 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-06 - Chapter 372
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fireworks; permissible use; Diwali.
Title
Fireworks; permissible use; Diwali.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 13 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-06-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 26 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-31 - House - House Military Affairs & Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-06 | Senate | Chapter 372 |
2022-07-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2022-06-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (13-15-2-0) |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2022-06-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2022-02-17 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-26-2-0) |
2022-02-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2022-02-07 | House | House consent calendar |
2022-02-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-31 | House | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-7-0-0-0-0) |
2022-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Assigned to House MAPS Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |