AZ HB2215 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; Route H60
Title
Appropriation; Route H60
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-02-17 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-1-0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-27 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-2-0-1-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | House | House read second time |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2021-01-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |