AZ HB2212 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 295
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 295
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Firearm possession; peace officers; definition
Title
Firearm possession; peace officers; definition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 295 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-22-3-0) |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-12 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-12 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-02-06 | House | House FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-23 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned to House FPRPP Committee |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Firearm
Firearm Possession
Peace Officer Standards And Training Board
Peace Officers
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Weapons
Firearm
Firearm Possession
Peace Officer Standards And Training Board
Peace Officers
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Weapons